EP0435651 - Digital superconducting quantum interference device having an extended dynamic range [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujimaki, Norio 1-22-26-303, Tsumadaminami Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa, 243 / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Bedggood, Guy Stuart, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314252.9 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890340965 | 26.12.1989 Original published format: JP 34096589 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435651 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435651 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435651 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/035 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G01R33/0356 (EP,US);
Y10S505/846 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Digitaler Squid mit erweitertem dynamischem Messbereich | [1991/27] | English: | Digital superconducting quantum interference device having an extended dynamic range | [1991/27] | French: | Squid digital ayant une portée dynamique étendue | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 22.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 05.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Request for further processing for: | 05.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3454875 (BOL MORRIS, et al); | [A]US3829768 (ROETTER M, et al); | [A]US3667033 (DAVIS CHARLES R); | [A]DE3616865 (UNIV KARLSRUHE INST FUER ELEKT [DE]) | [A] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS E. SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS. vol. 17, no. 6, June 1984, DORKING GB pages 504 - 512; J.O. LEKKALA ET AL.: 'Multiplexed SQUID vectormagnetometer for biomagnetic research' | [AP] - CRYOGENICS. vol. 30, no. 4, April 1990, GUILDFORD GB pages 330 - 334; H. MATZ ET AL.: 'High slew rate gradiometer prototype with digital feedback loop of variable step size' |