EP0435653 - Micropump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Hajime 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 02 /
Handa, Masaaki 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 03 /
Uehara, Taisuke 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 04 /
Muranaka, Tsukasa 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 05 /
Kamisuki, Shinichi 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | 06 /
Nose, Yasuto 3-5 Owa, 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | Sturt, Clifford Mark, et al J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | ||
Former [1991/27] | Miller, Joseph J. MILLER & CO. 34 Bedford Row, Holborn London WC1R 4JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314255.2 | 24.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890340469 | 27.12.1989 Original published format: JP 34046989 | JP19900019241 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1924190 | JP19900019242 | 31.01.1990 Original published format: JP 1924290 | JP19900027170 | 08.02.1990 Original published format: JP 2717090 | [1991/33] |
Former [1991/27] | JP19890340469 | 27.12.1989 | |
JP19900019241 | 31.01.1990 | ||
JP19900019242 | 31.01.1990 | ||
JP19900027170 | 08.02.1990 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0435653 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435653 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F04B43/04, F04B21/02 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
F04B53/1092 (EP,US);
F04B43/046 (EP,US);
B01L2400/0481 (EP);
F04B43/14 (EP,US);
H10N30/802 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1991/27] | Title | German: | Mikropumpe | [1991/27] | English: | Micropump | [1991/27] | French: | Micropompe | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 10.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/06] | 15.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2352966 (VALLEYLAB INC [US]); | [Y]US4596575 (ROSENBERG MEIR [IL], et al); | [XE]WO9015929 (WESTONBRIDGE INT LTD [IE], et al); | [XE]WO9101464 (WESTONBRIDGE INT LTD [IE], et al) |