EP0435676 - Liquid crystal display device for displaying multiple or full colors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ban, Mariko 1-1-721, Kunimi-cho, Saidaiji Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Kimura, Naofumi Heijou dai2 danchi 29-104, 1-2, Ukyou 2-chome Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Ishii, Yutaka 1-5-5-905, Oomiya-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1991/27] | Representative(s) | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/27] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314342.8 | 27.12.1990 | [1991/27] | Priority number, date | JP19890339958 | 28.12.1989 Original published format: JP 33995889 | [1991/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0435676 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0435676 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0435676 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/137, G02F1/1347 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
C09K19/544 (EP);
G02F1/1334 (EP);
G02F1/133514 (EP);
G02F1/13475 (EP);
G09G3/3607 (EP);
G09G3/3629 (EP);
G02F2202/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/27] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristall-Anzeigevorrichtung zur Anzeige von mehreren oder allen Farben | [1991/27] | English: | Liquid crystal display device for displaying multiple or full colors | [1991/27] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage à cristaux liquides pour afficher plusieurs ou toutes les couleurs | [1991/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP1063926 ; | [X]JP59010929 ; | [Y]JP60191226 ; | [A]JP54039664 ; | [A]JP53080242 ; | [Y]WO8802128 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 271 (P-889)9 March 1989 & JP-A-1 063 926 ( FUJI ELECTRIC ) 22 June 1989, & JP1063926 A 19890622 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 97 (P-272)20 January 1984 & JP-A-59 010 929 ( TOSHIBA ) 8 May 1984, & JP59010929 A 19840508 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 45 (P-430)21 February 1986 & JP-A-60 191 226 ( STANLEY DENKI ) 28 September 1985, & JP60191226 A 19850928 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 3, no. 61 (E-113)26 May 1979 & JP-A-54 039 664 ( SUWA SEIKOSHA ) 27 March 1979, & JP54039664 A 19790327 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 115 (E-59)25 September 1978 & JP-A-53 080 242 ( DAINI SEIKOSHA ) 15 July 1978, & JP53080242 A 19780715 | Examination | JP60191226 | JP54039664 | JP53080242 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 45 (P-430), 21 February 1986 ; & JP-A-60 191 226, & JP60191226 A 19860221 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 61 (E-113), 26 May 1979 ; & JP-A-54 039 664, & JP54039664 A 19790526 | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 115 (E-59), 25 September 1978 ; & JP-A-53 080 242, & JP53080242 A 19780925 |