EP0437108 - A control circuit for switching current in a load [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.1997 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.1998 [1998/04] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eccleston, Rex James 4708 Orchard Street Dearborn Michigan 47126 / US | 02 /
Bator, Philip Mark 23803 Wilmarth Farmington, Michigan 48024 / US | 03 /
Rutkoswki, David James 8752 Sarah Lane Grosse Ila, Michigan 48138 / US | [1991/29] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/29] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 90314372.5 | 28.12.1990 | [1991/29] | Priority number, date | US19900462193 | 09.01.1990 Original published format: US 462193 | [1991/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0437108 | Date: | 17.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0437108 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437108 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/08 | [1991/29] | CPC: |
H03K17/0822 (EP,US);
H03K17/0826 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/29] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung zum Schalten eines Stromes in einer Last | [1991/29] | English: | A control circuit for switching current in a load | [1991/29] | French: | Circuit de commande pour commuter du courant dans une charge | [1991/29] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/43] | 18.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2811149 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [X] - TOUTE L'ELECTRONIQUE. no. 539, December 1988, PARIS FR pages 32 - 37; 'Un composant d'aujourd'hui tourné vers l'avenir: Le MOSFET de puissance' |