EP0474945 - Method and system for driving multiple latching relays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTROLINE EQUIPMENT INC 8750, 8th Avenue, Ville St. Michel Montreal Quebec, H1Z 2W4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states ELECTROLINE EQUIPMENT INC 8750, 8th Avenue, Ville St. Michel Montreal, Quebec, H1Z 2W4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourgouin, Jaques 930 Des Cormiers Laval, Quebec, H7E 3Y3 / CA | 02 /
Terreault, Gerard 4655 Snyder Pierrefonds, Quebec, H9J 3P5 / CA | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Smith, Philip Antony, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1992/12] | Application number, filing date | 90314400.4 | 28.12.1990 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | US19900586812 | 24.09.1990 Original published format: US 586812 | CA19902025110 | 12.09.1990 Original published format: CA 2025110 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0474945 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474945 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01H47/00, H01H47/32 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
H01H47/001 (EP);
H01H47/226 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Ansteuerung von mehreren bistabilen Relais | [1992/12] | English: | Method and system for driving multiple latching relays | [1992/12] | French: | Méthode et système pour la commande de plusieurs relais bistabiles | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/42] | 20.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 07.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.09.1996 | IT | 04.09.1996 | NL | 04.09.1996 | SE | 04.12.1996 | DE | 05.12.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2003/07] | ES | 04.09.1996 | |
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
NL | 04.09.1996 | ||
SE | 04.12.1996 | ||
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 04.09.1996 | |
IT | 04.09.1996 | ||
SE | 04.12.1996 | ||
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.09.1996 | |
SE | 04.12.1996 | ||
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | SE | 04.12.1996 | |
DE | 05.12.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | DE | 05.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4040119 ; | [A]US4262213 |