EP0390615 - Opto-electronic measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/40] | Opto-electronic measuring circuit | ||
[1992/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHOTONETICS 52 Avenue de l'Europe 78160 Marly le Roi / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states PHOTONETICS 52 Avenue de l'Europe F-78160 Marly le Roi / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graindorge, Philippe 5, rue du Crucifix F-21800 Crimolois / FR | 02 /
Trouchet, Denis 79 Route de Sartrouville F-78230 Le Pecq / FR | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet HARLE et PHELIP 14-16, rue Ballu 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Michelet, Alain, et al Cabinet Harlé et Phelip 21 rue de la Rochefoucauld F-75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/40] | Michelet, Alain BOUJU DERAMBURE (BUGNION) S.A., 55 rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400100.5 | 15.01.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | FR19890000541 | 18.01.1989 Original published format: FR 8900541 | [1990/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0390615 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0390615 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390615 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
G01B9/02065 (EP,US);
G01B9/02032 (EP,US);
G01B9/02057 (EP,US);
G01B9/0209 (EP,US);
G01D5/266 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Opto-elektronische Messeinrichtung | [1992/50] | English: | Opto-electronic measuring device | [1992/50] | French: | Dispositif de mesure opto-électronique | [1990/40] |
Former [1990/40] | Opto-elektronische Messschaltung | ||
Former [1990/40] | Opto-electronic measuring circuit | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.1992 | DK | 09.12.1992 | ES | 09.12.1992 | GR | 09.12.1992 | NL | 09.12.1992 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DK | 09.12.1992 | ||
GR | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
DK | 09.12.1992 | ||
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 09.12.1992 | |
NL | 09.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 09.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1623156 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFTEN DDR); | [A]GB2144534 (BARR & STROUD LTD); | [A]GB2179146 (SHARP KK); | [A]EP0013974 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP [US]) |