EP0383679 - Apparatus for removing the surface layers of cylindrically shaped vegetables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.1991 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.1991 [1991/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fischer, Gérard Moulin Rateau, St-Martin-Sur-Oreuse F-89260 Thorigny sur Oreuse / FR | [1990/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/34] | Representative(s) | Kügele, Bernhard, et al Novapat France 63bis Boulevard Bessières 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/34] | Kügele, Bernhard, et al NOVAPAT FRANCE 63 bis, boulevard Bessières F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400395.1 | 13.02.1990 | [1990/34] | Priority number, date | FR19890001836 | 13.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8901836 | [1990/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0383679 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47J17/08, A23N7/04, B27L1/00 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
B27L1/127 (EP);
A23N7/04 (EP);
A47J17/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/34] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Oberflächenschichten von zylindrisch geformtem Gemüse | [1990/34] | English: | Apparatus for removing the surface layers of cylindrically shaped vegetables | [1990/34] | French: | Epluchoir pour légumes de forme sensiblement cylindrique | [1990/34] | File destroyed: | 09.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/42] | 22.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR609285 ; | [A]DE411991 ; | [A]US4549479 ; | [A]FR2387608 |