EP0387117 - Heat-fusible textile for stiffening and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 27.07.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.1994 | Opposition rejected | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAINIERE DE PICARDIE: Société anonyme B.P. 12 Buire-Courcelles 80200 Peronne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/37] | For all designated states LAINIERE DE PICARDIE: Société anonyme B.P. 12 Buire-Courcelles F-80200 Peronne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groshens, Pierre 94 Ter Rue Joliot Curie, Doingt-Flamincourt F-80200 Peronne / FR | [1990/37] | Representative(s) | Derambure, Christian BREESE DERAMBURE MAJEROWICZ 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Derambure, Christian Cabinet Bouju Derambure (Bugnion) S.A., 52, rue de Monceau F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/37] | Michelet, Alain BOUJU DERAMBURE (BUGNION) S.A., 55 rue Boissonade F-75014 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400484.3 | 21.02.1990 | [1990/37] | Priority number, date | FR19890003045 | 08.03.1989 Original published format: FR 8903045 | [1990/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0387117 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0387117 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/06, D04H13/00, D04B21/16 | [1990/37] | CPC: |
D04H13/00 (EP,US);
A41D27/06 (EP,US);
D04B21/165 (EP,US);
D04H1/44 (EP,US);
D04H1/46 (EP,US);
D04H1/541 (EP,US);
D04H1/549 (EP,US);
D04H1/55 (EP,US);
D10B2403/0112 (EP);
D10B2403/02411 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24033 (EP,US);
Y10T442/494 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/37] | Title | German: | Heissversiegelbares Textilmaterial für Verstärkungseinlagen und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1990/37] | English: | Heat-fusible textile for stiffening and method for its manufacture | [1990/37] | French: | Textile thermocollant destiné à l'entoilage et son procédé de fabrication | [1990/37] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 21.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.01.1993
09.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE Firma Carl Freudenberg Patente und Warenzeichen Höhnerweg 2 D-69465 Weinheim / DE | [1993/11] | 22.04.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 04.08.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.08.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 20.04.1994 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.04.1994 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3600259 (SMITH DELMONT K, et al); | [A]DE2017074 ; | [A]US4388364 (SANDERS KENNETH H); | [A]US4435467 (ROGERS JACK S [US]); | [AD]US4450196 (KAMAT DATTATRAYA V [US]); | [XD]US4737396 (KAMAT DATTATRAYA V [US]); | [A]EP0289378 (PICARDIE LAINIERE [FR]) | [A] - MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, INTERNATIONAL TEXTILE REPORTS. vol. 66, no. 6, juin 1985, HEIDELBERG DE pages 434 - 435; "Schussraschelgewirk als Beschichtungstraeger" |