Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0385852 | Global Dossier | 06.09.1995 | B1 | EP0385852 | 05.09.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8902562 | 28.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69022081T | 30.05.1996 | T2 | DE69022081D1 | 12.10.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8902562 | 28.02.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2643769 | 14.06.1991 | B1 | FR2643769 | 31.08.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8902562 | 28.02.1989 |