EP0385852 - Device for fast movement restitution by observation of a reflecting pattern and method for the realisation of the device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.1996 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/36] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deniau, Patrice 56 Côte de Narbonne F-78480 Verneuil / FR | 02 /
Hadet, Christian 84,rue Jean Jaurès F-95320 St Leu la Forêt / FR | 03 /
Laffitte, Olivier 22 rue Emile Dubois F-75124 Paris / FR | 04 /
Devars, Jean 39 rue Corot F-91140 Villebon Sur Yvette / FR | [1995/36] |
Former [1990/36] | 01 /
Deniau, Patrice 56 Côte de Narbonne F-78480 Verneuil / FR | ||
02 /
Hadet, Christian 84 rue Jean Jaurés F-95320 St Leu la Forêt / FR | |||
03 /
Laffitte, Olivier 22 rue Emile Dubois F-75124 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
Devars, Jean 39 rue Corot F-91140 Villebon Sur Yvette / FR | Representative(s) | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al BREVALEX 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Dubois-Chabert, Guy, et al Société de Protection des Inventions 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/36] | Mongrédien, André c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400541.0 | 27.02.1990 | [1990/36] | Priority number, date | FR19890002562 | 28.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8902562 | [1990/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0385852 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0385852 | Date: | 06.09.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/16, G01S5/00, G01S3/78, H04N5/14 | [1990/36] | CPC: |
G01S3/7864 (EP);
G01S5/0009 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
H04N5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1990/36] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Wiedergabe von schnellen Bewegungen durch Wahrnehmung einer retroreflektierenden Figur und Verfahren zur Ausführung der Einrichtung | [1990/36] | English: | Device for fast movement restitution by observation of a reflecting pattern and method for the realisation of the device | [1990/36] | French: | Dispositif de restitution de mouvement rapide par observation de mire rétroréfléchissante et procédé pour la mise en oeuvre du dispositif | [1990/36] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 25.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1996/14] | DE | 07.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0261091 ; | [A]GB1485619 ; | [A]GB2018422 |