Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0389358
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
30.11.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
18.10.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.1994 [1994/49] |
22.09.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] |
09.08.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] |
22.06.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |
20.05.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.1994 [1994/28] |
01.10.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.11.1993 [1993/46] |
08.05.1992 |
First examination report |
|
01.03.1991 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.04.1991 [1991/16] |
11.08.1990 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] |