EP0389358 - Opening system for spreading wings on a projectile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-BRANDT ARMEMENTS Tour Chenonceaux 204, rond-point du Pont de Sèvres 92516 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states THOMSON-BRANDT ARMEMENTS Tour Chenonceaux 204, rond-point du Pont de Sèvres F-92516 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baubry, Bernard Thomson-CSF, SCPI - Cédex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400758.0 | 20.03.1990 | [1990/39] | Priority number, date | FR19890003924 | 24.03.1989 Original published format: FR 8903924 | [1990/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0389358 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0389358 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F42B10/20 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
F42B10/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/39] | Title | German: | Leitwerkausspreizungssystem für ein Geschoss | [1990/39] | English: | Opening system for spreading wings on a projectile | [1990/39] | French: | Système d'ouverture d'un empennage déployant pour projectile | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 21.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.1993 | ES | 18.11.1993 | GB | 18.11.1993 | IT | 18.11.1993 | NL | 18.11.1993 | SE | 18.11.1993 | CH | 31.03.1994 | LI | 31.03.1994 | [2002/25] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
GB | 18.11.1993 | ||
IT | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
GB | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
CH | 31.03.1994 | ||
LI | 31.03.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
GB | 18.11.1993 | ||
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
NL | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 18.11.1993 | |
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2801587 (GOULD ALBERT S); | [A]US2821924 (HANSEN LAWRENCE J, et al); | [A]FR1152013 (BRAUNSCHWEIGER METALLWERK F CH); | [A]US3196793 (VELJKO MILENKOVIC, et al); | [A]US3304030 (WEIMHOLT JAMES E, et al); | [A]US4262862 (HUETTER HORST) |