EP0390653 - Mammography apparatus equipped with a stereotaxic device and method of using the apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC CGR S.A. 100, rue Camille-Desmoulins 92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC CGR S.A. 100, rue Camille-Desmoulins F-92130 Issy les Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romeas, René, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | 02 /
Rouchy, Didier, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | 03 /
Gilleron, Alain, Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 Rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400790.3 | 22.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | FR19890004086 | 29.03.1989 Original published format: FR 8904086 | [1990/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390653 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390653 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
A61B6/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1990/40] | Title | German: | Mammographiegerät mit Stereotaxieeinrichtung und Verfahren zur Anwendung des Geräts | [1990/40] | English: | Mammography apparatus equipped with a stereotaxic device and method of using the apparatus | [1990/40] | French: | Mammographe équipé d'un dispositif de prises de vues stéréotaxiques intégré et procédé d'utilisation d'un tel mammographe | [1992/24] |
Former [1990/40] | Mammographe équipé d'un dispositif de vue stéréotaxiques intégré et procédé d'utilisation d'un tel mamographe | Examination procedure | 22.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 22.08.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1993
26.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE NRT Nordisk Roentgen Teknik A/S Birkegaardsvej 16 DK-8361 Hasselager / DK Opponent's representative Nielsen, Leif Patrade A/S Ceresbyen 75 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1993
26.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE NRT Nordisk Roentgen Teknik A/S Birkegaardsvej 16 DK-8361 Hasselager / DK Opponent's representative Nielsen, Leif c/o Patrade A/S Store Torv 1 DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | ||
Former [1993/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.02.1993
NRT Nordisk Roentgen Teknik A/S Birkegaardsvej 16 DK-8361 Hasselager / DK Opponent's representative Nielsen, Leif c/o Lehmann & Ree A/S Ryesgade 3 DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | 23.04.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.11.1993 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 31.12.1993 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 30.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.02.1996 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.05.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 17.06.1992 | ES | 18.09.1992 | [2004/38] |
Former [1993/46] | GB | 17.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1541671 ; | [A]EP0071017 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0127073 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0146511 (CYTEX MEDICINTEKNIK AB [SE]); | [A]EP0288187 (CHEN HARRY HAITAK) |