EP0390654 - Aminobenzenesulfonic acid derivative [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/15] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1990/40] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI KASEI CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okushima, Hiromi 2747-3, Ozenji, Aso-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Narimatsu, Akihiro 3-3, Tsutsujigaoka, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kobayashi, Makio 2666-11 Honmachida Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Satoh, Naoya 23-4 Tanacho, Midori-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Morita, Miyuki 1-22-12, Nakatehara, Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/40] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/40] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400795.2 | 22.03.1990 | [1990/40] | Priority number, date | JP19890074684 | 27.03.1989 Original published format: JP 7468489 | JP19900064811 | 15.03.1990 Original published format: JP 6481190 | [1990/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390654 | Date: | 03.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0390654 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/096, C07D243/08, A61K31/495, A61K31/55 | [1990/40] | CPC: |
C07D295/096 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/40] | Title | German: | Aminobenzolsulfonsäurederivate | [1990/40] | English: | Aminobenzenesulfonic acid derivative | [1990/40] | French: | Dérivés de l'acide aminobenzènesulfonique | [1990/40] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 28.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1104514 (PARKE DAVIS & CO); | [A]DE2040279 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE2111811 (HOECHST AG); | [A]DE3715763 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |