EP0401059 - Plant-protecting composition, process for its preparation and its use, particularly for controlling downy vine mildew [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.1995 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROQUETTE FRERES 62136 Lestrem / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states ROQUETTE FRERES F-62136 Lestrem / FR | ||
Former [1994/27] | For all designated states Société ROQUETTE FRERES S.A. F-62136 Lestrem / FR | ||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states Roquette Frères F-62136 Lestrem / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malras, Jean-Claude 158, rue de Biez F-59193 Erquinghem Sur la Lys / FR | 02 /
Gosset, Serge 393, Chemin du Paradis F-62136 Lestrem / FR | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/49] | Koch, Gustave, et al Cabinet PLASSERAUD 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400814.1 | 23.03.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | FR19890007003 | 29.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8907003 | [1990/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401059 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401059 | Date: | 06.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01N59/20 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
A01N59/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N59/20, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N59/20, A01N25/10 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Pflanzenschutzmittel, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre Verwendung, insbesondere zur Bekämpfung von Rebenmehltau | [1990/49] | English: | Plant-protecting composition, process for its preparation and its use, particularly for controlling downy vine mildew | [1990/49] | French: | Composition phytosanitaire, son procédé de préparation et son utilisation, en particulier pour lutter contre le mildiou de la vigne | [1990/49] | Examination procedure | 24.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/51] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP58134004 ; | [X]JP63079802 ; | [X]WO8603939 (CHINOIN GYOGYSZER ES VEGYESZET [HU]) | [X] - CENTRAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, section C, semaine 83-38, 16 novembre 1983, Derwent Publishers Ltd, Londres, GB, A no: 83-767169 & JP-A-58 134 004 (KYUSHU SANKYO) 10-08-1983, & JP58134004 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL PATENTS INDEX, BASIC ABSTRACTS JOURNAL, section C, semaine 88/20, 13 juillet 1988, Derwent Publications Ltd, Londres, GB, A no: 88-137240 & JP-A-63 079 802 (NIHON NOYAKU) 09-04-1988, & JP63079802 A 00000000 |