EP0394096 - Videotex terminal capable of telecopy reception [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM 6, Avenue d'Iéna 75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | For all designated states SOCIETE D'APPLICATIONS GENERALES D'ELECTRICITE ET DE MECANIQUE SAGEM 6, Avenue d'Iéna F-75783 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Penalver, Georges 22 rue Henri Spysschaert F-78700 Conflans Sainte Honorine / FR | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Bloch, Gérard, et al Gevers France 41, Avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/43] | Bloch, Gérard, et al 2, square de l'Avenue du Bois F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90400977.6 | 10.04.1990 | [1990/43] | Priority number, date | FR19890004895 | 13.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8904895 | FR19890009613 | 18.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8909613 | [1990/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394096 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0394096 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/32713 (EP,US);
H04M11/085 (EP,US);
H04N1/32704 (EP,US);
H04N1/32771 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | Bildschirmtext-Endgerät, fähig zum Faksimile-Empfang | [1990/43] | English: | Videotex terminal capable of telecopy reception | [1990/43] | French: | Terminal vidéotex pouvant recevoir des télécopies | [1990/43] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 15.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57138269 ; | GB2169174 [ ] (CANON KK); | EP0208852 [ ] (CANON KK [JP]); | EP0222919 [ ] (ISS KK [JP]); | US4734780 [ ] (IWATA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | FR2607616 [ ] (FRAMATOME SA [FR], et al); | EP0310001 [ ] (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 238 (E-144)[1116], 26 novembre 1982; & JP-A-57 138 269 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 26-08-1982, & JP57138269 A 00000000 | [A] - COMMUNICATION & TRANSMISSION, vol. 9, no. 2, 1987, pages 57-60, Paris, FR; "Le terminal télématique agora" | Examination | FR2607646 |