EP0395510 - Method and device for determining the distribution of beta-rays emitted from a surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOSPACE INSTRUMENTS 12, rue de la Glacière F-75013 Paris / FR | [1994/34] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states BIOSPACE INSTRUMENTS 13, rue Thouin F-75005 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charpak, Georges 37, rue de la Plaine F-75020 Paris / FR | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 Rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1990/44] | Fréchède, Michel, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401127.7 | 25.04.1990 | [1990/44] | Priority number, date | FR19890005605 | 27.04.1989 Original published format: FR 8905605 | [1990/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0395510 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0395510 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J47/26, G01T1/29 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
H01J47/26 (EP,US);
G01T1/2935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, SE [1990/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verteilungsbestimmung von aus einer Fläche austretenden beta-Strahlen | [1990/44] | English: | Method and device for determining the distribution of beta-rays emitted from a surface | [1990/44] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour déterminer la distribution des rayons beta- émergeant d'une surface | [1990/44] | Examination procedure | 22.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 05.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 15.09.1994 | [1995/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2111992 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]GB2190787 (PULLAN DR BRIAN ROBERT) | [AD] - NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS AND METHODS. vol. 176, 1980, AMSTERDAM NL pages 239 - 244; Petersen et al.: "The multistep avalanche chamber as a detector in radiochromatography imaging" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE. vol. 35, no. 1, février 1988, NEW YORK US pages 483 - 486; G. Charpak et al.: "Some applications of the imaging proportionnal chamber" | Examination | - "Gas discharge tubes", 1964, H.C. v/d Horst, Philips Technical Library. |