EP0401063 - Polymers with nonlinear optical activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/49] | Organic material active in nonlinear optics | ||
[1994/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLAMEL TECHNOLOGIES Parc Club du Moulin à Vent 33, avenue du Docteur Georges Lévy 69693 Venissieux Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states FLAMEL TECHNOLOGIES Parc Club du Moulin à Vent 33, avenue du Docteur Georges Levy F-69693 Venissieux Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1990/49] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barthélémy, Pascal 21, rue de la Part Dieu F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
Mignani, Gérard 2, avenue des Frères Lumière F-69008 Lyon / FR | 03 /
Meyrueix, Rémi 112 Cours Albert Thomas F-69008 Lyon / FR | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Thibault, Jean-Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Thibault, Jean-Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 51, Avenue Jean Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1990/49] | Ricalens, François RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriéte Industrielle, 25, quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401164.0 | 27.04.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | FR19890005870 | 03.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8905870 | [1990/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401063 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0401063 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/38 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
C08G18/7678 (EP,US);
C08G18/3836 (EP,US);
C08G18/3838 (EP,US);
C08G18/384 (EP,US);
C08G18/678 (EP,US);
C08G18/679 (EP,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08G18/771 (EP,US);
C08G18/792 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Polymere mit nichtlinearer optischer Aktivität | [1994/44] | English: | Polymers with nonlinear optical activity | [1994/44] | French: | Polymères actifs en optique non linéaire | [1994/44] |
Former [1990/49] | In nichtlinearer Optik aktives organisches Material | ||
Former [1990/49] | Organic material active in nonlinear optics | ||
Former [1990/49] | Matériau organique actif en optique non linéaire | Examination procedure | 02.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/14] | 25.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.11.1994 | DK | 02.11.1994 | ES | 02.11.1994 | GR | 02.11.1994 | IT | 02.11.1994 | SE | 02.02.1995 | BE | 30.04.1995 | CH | 30.04.1995 | LI | 30.04.1995 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
DK | 02.11.1994 | ||
ES | 02.11.1994 | ||
GR | 02.11.1994 | ||
IT | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
DK | 02.11.1994 | ||
GR | 02.11.1994 | ||
IT | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
DK | 02.11.1994 | ||
IT | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
DK | 02.11.1994 | ||
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
CH | 30.04.1995 | ||
LI | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
BE | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 02.11.1994 | |
SE | 02.02.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 02.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1219438 (CIBA GEIGY); | [X]DE2426172 (BAYER AG); | [A]DE3636972 (BAYER AG [DE]) | Examination | JPS63175837 |