EP0397548 - Wrist-watches [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHANEL 135 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 92523 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/46] | For all designated states CHANEL 135 Avenue Charles de Gaulle F-92523 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Helleu, Jacques c/o Chanel 135 avenue Charles de Gaulle F-92521 Neuilly sur Seine Cedex / FR | [1990/46] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée F-75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1990/46] | Lhuillier, René Cabinet Lepeudry, 52, avenue Daumesnil F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401189.7 | 03.05.1990 | [1990/46] | Priority number, date | FR19890006044 | 09.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8906044 | [1990/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0397548 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/16 | [1990/46] | CPC: |
G04B37/1486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/46] | Title | German: | Armbanduhren | [1990/46] | English: | Wrist-watches | [1990/46] | French: | Perfectionnements aux montres-bracelets | [1990/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 05.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2206060 ; | [A]GB2163038 ; | [A]CH436138 ; | [A]FR2398333 ; | [A]CH337465 ; | [A]FR2201055 |