EP0421824 - A surface mounted led package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIALIGHT CORPORATION 1913 Atlantic Avenue Manasquan New Jersey 08736 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | For all designated states DIALIGHT CORPORATION 1913 Atlantic Avenue Manasquan, New Jersey 08736 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dragoon, Daniel Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1991/15] | Representative(s) | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7 Rue Le Sueur 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/15] | Schmit, Christian Norbert Marie, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401285.3 | 15.05.1990 | [1991/15] | Priority number, date | US19890417469 | 05.10.1989 Original published format: US 417469 | [1991/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0421824 | Date: | 10.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0421824 | Date: | 24.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00 | [1991/15] | CPC: |
B60Q1/2696 (EP,US);
F21V19/0015 (EP,US);
H01L33/486 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H05K3/301 (EP,US);
Y10S362/80 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/15] | Title | German: | Oberflächenmontiertes LED-Gehäuse | [1991/15] | English: | A surface mounted led package | [1991/15] | French: | Boîtier de led pour montage en surface | [1991/15] | Examination procedure | 16.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/30] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 24.04.1996 | NL | 24.04.1996 | SE | 24.07.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1998/15] | DK | 24.04.1996 | |
SE | 24.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 24.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0230336 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR], et al); | [A]US4843280 (LUMBARD MARVIN [US], et al); | [A]EP0108484 (SAVAGE JOHN JUN) |