EP0403337 - Windscreen wiper system with rain detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.10.1994 [1994/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday 78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES D'ESSUYAGE 11, rue Faraday F-78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Guy 3, rue des Jonnières F-91570 Bievres / FR | [1990/51] | Representative(s) | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2 Rue Andrée Boulle B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/51] | Gamonal, Didier Valeo Management Services Sce Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle B.P. 150 F-94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401563.3 | 08.06.1990 | [1990/51] | Priority number, date | FR19890007715 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: FR 8907715 | [1990/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0403337 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0403337 | Date: | 03.11.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/08 | [1990/51] | CPC: |
B60S1/485 (EP,US);
B60S1/08 (KR);
Y10S318/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1990/51] | Title | German: | Scheibenwischersystem mit Regendetektor | [1990/51] | English: | Windscreen wiper system with rain detector | [1990/51] | French: | Système d'essuie-glace avec détecteur de pluie | [1990/51] | Examination procedure | 15.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6078844 ; | [A]JP60174931 ; | [A]DE3538553 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]); | [A]DE3715798 (HUBER ERICH ING GRAD [DE]); | [A]EP0249031 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3244767 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 219 (M-410)(1942) 06 septembre 1985, & JP-A-60 78844 (NIPPON DENSO) 04 mai 1985,, & JP6078844 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 22 (P-424)(2079) 28 janvier 1986, & JP-A-60 174931 (NAIRUSU BUHIN) 09 septembre 1985,, & JP60174931 A 00000000 | Examination | JP6078844 | - & JP-A-60 78844 (NIPPON DENSO) 04 mai 1985,, & JP6078844 A 00000000 |