EP0408447 - Precast curb system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GROUPE PERMACON INC. 8145, Rue Bombardier Ville d'Anjou Quebec H1J 1A5 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | For all designated states GROUPE PERMACON INC. 8145, Rue Bombardier Ville d'Anjou, Quebec H1J 1A5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castonguay, Bertin 80 Berlioz, Apt. 1005, Nuns' Island Verdun, Quebec, H3E 1L9 / CA | 02 /
Ratte, Alain 1129 de Noyan, Terrebonne Quebec, J6X 1Y5 / CA | [1993/43] |
Former [1991/03] | 01 /
Castonguay, Bertin 80 Berlioz, Apt. 1005, Nuns Island Verdun, Quebec, H3E 1L9 / CA | ||
02 /
Ratte, Alain 1129 de Noyan, Terrebonne Quebec, J6X 1Y5 / CA | Representative(s) | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/03] | Schrimpf, Robert, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90401993.2 | 11.07.1990 | [1991/03] | Priority number, date | CA19890605565 | 13.07.1989 Original published format: CA 605565 | [1991/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0408447 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0408447 | Date: | 27.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E01C11/22, B28B7/20 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
E01C11/222 (EP,US);
B28B7/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/03] | Title | German: | Vorgefertigtes Kantenstein-System | [1991/03] | English: | Precast curb system | [1991/03] | French: | Système de bordures préfabriquées | [1991/03] | Examination procedure | 11.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 09.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.10.1993 | CH | 27.10.1993 | DK | 27.10.1993 | ES | 27.10.1993 | GR | 27.10.1993 | LI | 27.10.1993 | SE | 27.10.1993 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
DK | 27.10.1993 | ||
GR | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
DK | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/32] | AT | 27.10.1993 | |
CH | 27.10.1993 | ||
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | CH | 27.10.1993 | |
LI | 27.10.1993 | ||
SE | 27.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 27.10.1993 | |
LI | 27.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2024659 ; | [AD]US3822954 (ANSGARIUSSON R); | [A]DE2728833 (FRISCHEISEN ADOLF DIPL ING); | [A]DE3023305 (LARSEN JOERGEN); | [AD]EP0118872 |