EP0410896 - Improvements on hydraulic vibration dampers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAULSTRA GMBH Postfach 12 09 62 D-68060 Mannheim / DE | [1991/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spaltofski, Ralf Buchenstrasse 82 D-6700 Ludwigshafen / DE | [1991/05] | Representative(s) | Burbaud, Eric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/25] | Burbaud, Eric, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1991/05] | Behaghel, Pierre, et al CABINET PLASSERAUD 84 rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402175.5 | 27.07.1990 | [1991/05] | Priority number, date | FR19890010242 | 28.07.1989 Original published format: FR 8910242 | [1991/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0410896 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0410896 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/00 | [1991/05] | CPC: |
F16F13/08 (EP,US);
F16F13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/05] | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an hydraulischen Schwingungsdämpfern | [1991/05] | English: | Improvements on hydraulic vibration dampers | [1991/05] | French: | Perfectionnements aux dispositifs amortisseurs de vibrations | [1991/05] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 12.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1995
19.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Metzeler Gimetall AG Erbacher Str. 50 D-64744 Breuberg / DE Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus Flügel Preissner Kastel Schober Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 31 02 03 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1995
19.01.1995
ADMISSIBLE Metzeler Gimetall AG Erbacher Str. 50 D-64744 Breuberg / DE Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Michelis & Preissner, Haimhauser Strasse 1 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.01.1995
Metzeler Gimetall AG Erbacher Str. 50 D-64744 Breuberg / DE Opponent's representative Preissner, Nicolaus, Dipl.-Ing. Seibert Michelis Preissner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Tattenbachstrasse 9 D-80538 München / DE | 01.03.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 05.09.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 16.03.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 20.04.1994 | NL | 20.04.1994 | SE | 20.04.1994 | BE | 31.07.1994 | LU | 31.07.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/23] | IT | 20.04.1994 | |
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
SE | 20.04.1994 | ||
BE | 31.07.1994 | ||
LU | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [2000/06] | IT | 20.04.1994 | |
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
BE | 31.07.1994 | ||
LU | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 20.04.1994 | |
NL | 20.04.1994 | ||
BE | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/30] | NL | 20.04.1994 | |
BE | 31.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | NL | 20.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE8717411U ; | [Y]CH577126 (ARFINA ANSTALT FINANZ); | [A]EP0134839 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]); | [A]DE3005983 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]); | [A]GB2055172 (GOMMA ANTIVIBRANTI APPLIC); | [A]EP0118887 (PIRELLI [IT]); | [A]EP0256762 (DUNLOP LTD [GB]); | [A]FR1505877 (LITTON INDUSTRIES INC); | [AD]FR2549558 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) |