EP0412875 - Temperature measuring device for induction cooking apparatus and apparatus equipped with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE EUROPEENNE POUR L'EQUIPEMENT MENAGER "CEPEM" 18 rue du 11 Octobre F-45140 St Jean-de-la-Ruelle / FR | [1991/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gouardo, Didier THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P.329 50, rue J.-P. Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | 02 /
Boyer, Serge THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue J.-P. Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | 03 /
Pitot, Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue J.-P. Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [1996/16] |
Former [1991/07] | 01 /
Gouardo, Didier THOMSON-CSF SCPI-cedex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | ||
02 /
Boyer, Serge THOMSON-CSF SCPI-cedex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | |||
03 /
Pitot, Pierre THOMSON-CSF SCPI-cedex 67 F-92045 Paris la Défense / FR | Representative(s) | Benoit, Monique, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/22] | Benoit, Monique, et al THOMSON-CSF SCPI B.P. 329 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1991/07] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS 9 Place des Vosges La Défense 10 F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402191.2 | 31.07.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | FR19890010527 | 04.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8910527 | [1991/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412875 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412875 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/12 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP,US);
G01K1/00 (KR);
H05B2213/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1991/07] | Title | German: | Temperaturmessvorrichtung für Induktionskochgerät und Gerät mit einer solchen Vorrichtung | [1991/07] | English: | Temperature measuring device for induction cooking apparatus and apparatus equipped with such a device | [1991/07] | French: | Dispositif de mesure de température pour appareil de cuisson à induction et appareil comportant un tel dispositif | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 22.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 17.04.1996 | GB | 17.04.1996 | IT | 17.04.1996 | SE | 17.07.1996 | LU | 31.07.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/06] | GB | 17.04.1996 | |
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
LU | 31.07.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | GB | 17.04.1996 | |
IT | 17.04.1996 | ||
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/14] | GB | 17.04.1996 | |
SE | 17.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 17.07.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2260249 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]FR1396923 (BODENSEEWERK PERKIN ELMER CO); | [A]US4319109 (BOWLES HOWARD R); | [A]US3786220 (HARNDEN J); | [A]GB2095834 (EGO ELEKTRO BLANC & FISCHER); | [A]EP0082768 (EUROP COMPOSANTS ELECTRON [FR]) |