EP0412009 - Multi-cylinder petrol injection engine with three valves per cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.09.1993 [1993/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | For all designated states REGIE NATIONALE DES USINES RENAULT Boîte postale 103 8-10 avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gastaldi, Patrick 22, rue Geneviève Couturier F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 02 /
Cliville, François 242, Rue de Seine F-76410 Cleon / FR | [1991/06] | Representative(s) | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al 8/10, avenue Emile Zola 92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/06] | Ernst-Schonberg, Michel, et al 8/10, avenue Emile Zola F-92109 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402203.5 | 01.08.1990 | [1991/06] | Priority number, date | FR19890010440 | 02.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8910440 | [1991/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412009 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02B19/12, F02B23/10 | [1991/06] | CPC: |
F02B19/12 (EP);
F02B23/104 (EP);
F02F1/4214 (EP);
F02B2023/102 (EP);
F02B2023/108 (EP);
F02B2075/125 (EP);
F02B2275/40 (EP);
F02B2275/48 (EP);
F02B3/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/06] | Title | German: | Mehrzylinder-Benzineinspritzmotor mit drei Ventilen pro Zylinder | [1991/06] | English: | Multi-cylinder petrol injection engine with three valves per cylinder | [1991/06] | French: | Moteur multicylindre à injection d'essence, comportant trois soupapes par cylindre | [1991/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 13.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.07.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6128713 ; | [A]JP59147819 ; | [Y]DE1922026 (FRACKE DR KARL); | [Y]FR977695 (CITROEN SA ANDRE); | [A]FR2178365 (CHRYSLER FRANCE [FR]); | [A]EP0085258 (RICARDO CONSULTING ENG [GB]); | [A]DE1526293 (FORD WERKE AG); | [A]DE3622616 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]); | [A]FR870359 ; | [A]GB1119758 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 181 (M-492)(2237) 25 juin 1986, & JP-A-61 28713 (YANMAR DIESEL) 08 février 1986,, & JP6128713 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 276 (M-346)(1713) 18 décembre 1984, & JP-A-59 147819 (YANMAR DIESEL) 24 août 1984,, & JP59147819 A 00000000 |