EP0413624 - Gas separation membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Avrillon, René 5, rue Marie Champsmesle F-78600 Maisons Laffite / FR | 02 /
Deschamps, André 3, Chemin des Princes F-78590 Noisy le Roi / FR | 03 /
Driancourt, Alain 4, rue François Villon F-92340 Bourg la Reine / FR | 04 /
Mileo, Jean-Claude La Fontaine Amélie F-38330 Saint Ismier / FR | 05 /
Robert, Eric 11, rue Fillette Nicolas Philibert F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [1991/08] | Application number, filing date | 90402223.3 | 02.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | FR19890010958 | 14.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8910958 | [1991/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413624 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B01D71/64, B01D53/22, C08G73/10 | [1991/08] | CPC: |
B01D71/641 (EP,US);
C08G73/1042 (EP,US);
C08G73/1078 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/08] | Title | German: | Membran zur Trennung von Gasen | [1991/08] | English: | Gas separation membrane | [1991/08] | French: | Membrane de séparation de gaz | [1991/08] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 09.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 02.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/35] | 02.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]USRE30351E ; | [A]EP0023406 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]EP0077718 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) |