EP0412890 - Device for rendering guard structures conspicuous [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIBERT MANUTENTION 6, rue Benjamin Constant F-92521 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [1993/12] |
Former [1991/07] | For all designated states ALLIBERT S.A. Société anonyme dite: 129, avenue Léon Blum F-38042 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moret, Michel 68, rue de Saint Leu F-95600 Eaubonne / FR | 02 /
Bouhanna, Claude 13, allée de la Coudraie F-78480 Verneuil sur Seine / FR | [1991/07] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/07] | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402241.5 | 03.08.1990 | [1991/07] | Priority number, date | FR19890010717 | 09.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8910717 | [1991/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0412890 | Date: | 13.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0412890 | Date: | 15.09.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | E01F15/00 | [1991/07] | CPC: |
E01F9/669 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1991/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anzeigen von Strassenleitmittel | [1991/07] | English: | Device for rendering guard structures conspicuous | [1991/07] | French: | Dispositif de visualisation pour élément ou ouvrage de bordure de chaussée | [1991/07] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 22.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 15.09.1993 | GB | 15.09.1993 | [1994/41] |
Former [1994/22] | DE | 15.09.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2208415 ; | [A]FR2533055 ; | [A]DE7145792U ; | [A]DE3607983 ; | [A]US4224002 |