EP0414591 - Use as additives of copper and zinc dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl dithiophosphates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/09] | Copper dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl dithiophosphates, their preparation and their use as additives for lubricants | ||
[1994/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.10.1995 [1995/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/09] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Born, Maurice 72, rue du Vieux Pont F-92000 Nanterre / FR | 02 /
Hipeaux, Jean-Claude 22, rue de la Fraternité F-92700 Colombes / FR | 03 /
Maran, Valérie 18, rue Paul Olivier F-92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | 04 /
Rossi, Armand 22, rue Vattelière F-76290 Montivilliers / FR | 05 /
Thebault, Michel 71 Boulevard de Strasbourg F-76600 Le Havre / FR | [1991/09] | Application number, filing date | 90402274.6 | 08.08.1990 | [1991/09] | Priority number, date | FR19890011153 | 21.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8911153 | [1991/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0414591 | Date: | 27.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0414591 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0414591 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/165, C10M137/10 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
C07F9/1651 (EP,US);
C10M137/10 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US);
C10N2010/02 (EP,US);
C10N2010/04 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C10M2223/045, C10M2223/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT, NL [1991/09] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Kupfer- und Zink- Dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl dithiophosphate | [1994/41] | English: | Use as additives of copper and zinc dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl dithiophosphates | [1994/41] | French: | Utilisation comme additifs de dihydrocarbyldithiophosphyldithiophosphate de cuivre et zinc | [1994/41] |
Former [1991/09] | Kupfer-Dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl-dithiophosphate, ihre Herstellung und ihre Verwendung als Additive für Schmiermittel | ||
Former [1991/09] | Copper dithiophosphyldihydrocarbyl dithiophosphates, their preparation and their use as additives for lubricants | ||
Former [1991/09] | Dihydrocarbyldithiophosphyl-dithiophosphates de cuivre, leur préparation et leur utilisation comme additifs pour lubrifiants | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 06.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0216676 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]); | [A]DE948156 (DEUTSCHE ERDOEL AG) | Examination | US4766228 |