EP0416988 - Device for laser shock treatment of work pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75700 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fabbro, Remy 24/26 rue Galliéni F-94230 Cachan / FR | 02 /
Fournier, Jean 6 rue Lyautey F-75016 Paris / FR | [1991/11] | Representative(s) | Signore, Robert, et al c/o BREVATOME 3, rue du Docteur Lanceraux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | Signore, Robert, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/11] | Mongrédien, André c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402422.1 | 03.09.1990 | [1991/11] | Priority number, date | FR19890011581 | 05.09.1989 Original published format: FR 8911581 | [1991/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0416988 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0416988 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C21D10/00, C21D1/09, B23K26/02 | [1991/11] | CPC: |
B23K26/06 (EP);
B23K26/064 (EP);
C21D1/09 (EP);
C21D10/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Laser-Schock-Behandlung von Werkstücken | [1991/11] | English: | Device for laser shock treatment of work pieces | [1991/11] | French: | Dispositif de traitement de pièces par chocs laser | [1991/11] | Examination procedure | 12.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/41] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 14.12.1994 | [1999/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0319397 ; | [Y]US4707073 ; | [A]US4311357 ; | [A]FR2606518 ; | [A]GB2037000 ; | [AD]EP0094912 | [A] - WELDING INTERNATIONAL, vol. 1, no. 10, 1987, pages 935-940, Abington, Cambridge, GB; H. MARUO et al.: "Surface modification by laser and electron beams" | Examination | EP0077207 |