EP0419327 - Amino acid derivatives, method for their preparation and their therapeutic application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE CIVILE BIOPROJET 30, rue des Francs Bourgeois F-75003 Paris / FR | [1991/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plaquevent, Jean-Christophe 74, allée Messager F-75960 Notre Dame de Bondeville / FR | 02 /
Danvy, Denis 16, Parc du Cailly F-76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR | 03 /
Monteil, Thierry 17, rue Henri-Vermont F-76000 Rouen / FR | 04 /
Greciet, Hélène 16, Voie de Bas F-27100 Val de Reuil / FR | 05 /
Duhamel, Lucette 32, rue Jacques Boutrolle F-76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR | 06 /
Duhamel, Pierre 32, rue Jacques Boutrolle F-76130 Mont Saint Aignan / FR | 07 /
Gros, Claude 31, rue Robert de Flers F-75015 Paris / FR | 08 /
Schwartz, Jean-Charles 9, villa Seurat F-75014 Paris / FR | 09 /
Lecomte, Jeanne-Marie 30, rue des Francs-Bourgeois F- 75003 - Paris / FR | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Bernasconi, Jean, et al Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402530.1 | 14.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | FR19890012142 | 15.09.1989 Original published format: FR 8912142 | [1991/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419327 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419327 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C323/60, C07D317/60, C07D319/18, C07D405/12, C07F9/38, C07D307/79, C07K5/06, A61K37/02 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C323/60 (EP);
C07D317/60 (EP);
C07D319/18 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
C07F9/3882 (EP);
C07F9/65517 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | Aminosäurederivate, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und ihre therapeutische Anwendung | [1991/13] | English: | Amino acid derivatives, method for their preparation and their therapeutic application | [1991/13] | French: | Dérivés d'amino-acides, leur procédé de préparation et leurs applications thérapeutiques | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 20.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 25.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61165362 ; | [X]EP0038046 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]EP0038758 (ROQUES BERNARD [FR], et al); | [X]EP0066956 (PFIZER [US]); | [X]EP0075896 (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]); | [X]EP0082088 (ROQUES BERNARD [FR], et al); | [A]US4401677 (GREENBERG ROLAND [US], et al); | [A]EP0136883 (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | [A]FR2609289 (BELLON LABOR SA ROGER [FR], et al); | [X]EP0309766 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [X]EP0322633 (SCHERING CORP [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 373 (C-391)[2430], 12 décembre 1986; & JP-A-61 165 362 (MEITO SANGYO) 26-07-1986, & JP61165362 A 00000000 | [X] - CHEMICAL AND PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN, vol. 35, no. 6, juin 1987, pages 2388-2393, Tokyo, JP; K. TAKETOSHI et al.: "Sulfur-containing acylamino acids. II. Synthesis and angiotensin I converting enzyme-inhibitory activities of N-mercaptoalkanoyl-S-ethyl-L-cysteine" |