EP0419358 - Process for the preparation of disilane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.1996 [1996/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parent, Jean-Claude 38,40, bd Raymond Poincaré F-92380 Garches / FR | 02 /
Renaudin, Marie-Hélène 6, rue François Mouthon F-75015 Paris / FR | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402593.9 | 20.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | FR19890012478 | 22.09.1989 Original published format: FR 8912478 | [1991/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419358 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419358 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/04 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
C01B33/046 (EP,US);
C01B33/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Disilan | [1991/13] | English: | Process for the preparation of disilane | [1991/13] | French: | Procédé de préparation de disilane | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1990 | Examination requested [1991/13] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6325210 ; | [A]JP63147815 ; | [A]JP6153106 ; | [A]US3982912 (YATSURUGI YOSHIFUMI, et al); | [A]EP0314542 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [A]US4554141 (SCULL HERBERT M [US], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 230 (C-508)(3077), 29 June 1988; & JP-A-6325210 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) 02.02.1988, & JP6325210 A 19880629 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 410 (C-540)(3257), 28 octobre 1988; & JP-A-63147815 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEM. INC.) 20.06.1988, & JP63147815 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 214 (C-362)(2270), 25 juillet 1986; & JP-A-6153106 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 17.03.1986, & JP6153106 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS vol. 66, no. 8, 20 février 1967, page 3102, abrégé no. 32346w, Columbus, Ohio, US; M.V. SUSIC et al.: "Ion-exchange equilibriums in molecular sieve 4A" & Trans. Faraday Soc. 1966, vol. 62, no. 12, pages 3479-3483 |