EP0422999 - Catalysts for treating exhaust gases and process for treating these exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25 Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/16] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25 Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chopin, Thierry 44, rue Auguste Poullain, Résidence Clos du Lendit F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | 02 /
Hebrard, Jean-Luc 31, rue Dauphine F-75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
Quemere, Eric 11 bis rue du Martray F-95240 Cormeilles/En/Parisis / FR | [1991/16] | Representative(s) | Dubruc, Philippe, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Dubruc, Philippe, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1991/16] | Dubruc, Philippe RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Service Brevets Chimie 25, quai Paul-Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402761.2 | 05.10.1990 | [1991/16] | Priority number, date | FR19890013141 | 09.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8913141 | [1991/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0422999 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/36, C01B17/04 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
B01D53/8606 (EP);
B01J35/00 (KR);
B01D53/8603 (KR);
B01D53/8612 (EP);
B01J27/053 (KR);
B01J27/24 (KR);
B01J35/56 (KR);
B01J35/60 (KR);
B01J37/0009 (KR);
C01B17/0465 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/16] | Title | German: | Katalysatoren zur Behandlung von Abgasen und Verfahren zur Behandlung dieser Abgase | [1991/16] | English: | Catalysts for treating exhaust gases and process for treating these exhaust gases | [1991/16] | French: | Catalyseurs pour le traitement des effluents gazeux et procédé de traitement de ces effluents | [1991/16] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 30.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1996/50] | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP6054903 ; | [AD]EP0060742 (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]); | [X]US4382912 (MADGAVKAR AJAY M, et al); | [AD]EP0078690 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [X]EP0244301 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [X]EP0272979 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 184 (C-294)[1907], 30 juillet 1985; & JP-A-60 54 903 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 29-03-1985, & JP6054903 A 00000000 |