EP0433100 - Device for attaching a seat cover to a motor car seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.02.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.04.1995 [1995/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/25] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Picard, Jean 69, rue Jules Michelet F-92700 Colombes / FR | [1991/25] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1993/33] | Polus, Camille c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1991/25] | Varady, Peter Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402835.4 | 10.10.1990 | [1991/25] | Priority number, date | FR19890016354 | 11.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916354 | [1991/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0433100 | Date: | 19.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0433100 | Date: | 13.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/02 | [1991/25] | CPC: |
B60N2/5825 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/25] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Befestigen eines Überzuges eines Kraftzeugsitzes | [1991/25] | English: | Device for attaching a seat cover to a motor car seat | [1991/25] | French: | Dispositif de rappel de la coiffe d'un siège automobile | [1991/25] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/25] | 14.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0252783 ; | [AD]EP0240388 ; | [A]EP0231692 ; | [A]DE3037834 |