EP0426520 - Cleaning composition of keratinous material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubief, Claude 9, rue Edmond Rostand F-78150 Le Chesnay / FR | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 90402850.3 | 12.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | FR19890013459 | 13.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8913459 | [1991/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426520 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426520 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
A61K8/892 (EP,US);
A61K8/585 (EP,US);
A61K8/73 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1991/19] | Title | German: | Waschmittel für Keratinmaterialien | [1994/24] | English: | Cleaning composition of keratinous material | [1991/19] | French: | Composition de lavage des matières kératiniques | [1991/19] |
Former [1991/19] | Waschmittel für keratinisierte Stoffe | Examination procedure | 04.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 29.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.1994 | DK | 15.06.1994 | GR | 15.06.1994 | NL | 15.06.1994 | SE | 15.09.1994 | BE | 31.10.1994 | CH | 31.10.1994 | LI | 31.10.1994 | [2000/04] |
Former [1998/15] | AT | 15.06.1994 | |
DK | 15.06.1994 | ||
NL | 15.06.1994 | ||
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
BE | 31.10.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 15.06.1994 | |
NL | 15.06.1994 | ||
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
BE | 31.10.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 15.06.1994 | |
NL | 15.06.1994 | ||
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
CH | 31.10.1994 | ||
LI | 31.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 15.06.1994 | |
NL | 15.06.1994 | ||
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/13] | NL | 15.06.1994 | |
SE | 15.09.1994 | ||
Former [1995/05] | SE | 15.09.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3659025 (HALLECK FRANK E); | [Y]EP0074264 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [A]GB2188060 (OREAL); | [A]GB2211192 (OREAL [FR]); | [X]EP0331915 (OREAL [FR]); | [AP]EP0362048 (OREAL [FR]) |