EP0426531 - Microprocessor test system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni 94250 Gentilly / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/19] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 7, Avenue Galliéni F-94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charvin, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | [1991/19] | Representative(s) | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot 122, rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques, et al Cabinet Ballot-Schmit, 7, rue Le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/19] | Ballot, Paul Denis Jacques Cabinet Ballot-Schmit 7, rue le Sueur F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90402995.6 | 24.10.1990 | [1991/19] | Priority number, date | FR19890014298 | 31.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8914298 | [1991/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0426531 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0426531 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/26 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
G06F11/2236 (EP,US);
G06F11/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1991/19] | Title | German: | Prüfsystem für einen Mikroprozessor | [1991/19] | English: | Microprocessor test system | [1991/19] | French: | Système de test d'un microprocesseur | [1991/19] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/31] | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4366393 (KASUYA YOSHIHIRO); | [A]US3961252 (EICHELBERGER EDWARD B) | [A] - COMPUTER, vol. 13, no. 3, mars 1980, pages 17-25, IEEE, Long Beach, CA, US; J.P. HAYES et al.: "Testability considerations in microprocessor-based design" | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL COMMUNICATIONS FORUM, vol. 40, partie II, 1986, pages 1162-1169, Oak Brook, Illinois, US; H.A. KALVONJIAN et al.: "Built-in self-test" | Examination | - self-test" |