EP0428446 - Simplified observation and laser-treatment endoscope for use in a cavity of a human body [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CROISY, Renaud 15 rue Marignac CH-1206 Geneve / CH | For all designated states Croisy, Nicolas 15 rue Marignac CH-1206 Geneve / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/21] | For all designated states Croisy, Renaud 15 rue Marignac CH-1206 Geneve / CH | ||
For all designated states Croisy, Nicolas 15 rue Marignac CH-1206 Geneve / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Croisy, Renaud 15 rue Maignac CH-120 Genève / CH | 02 /
Croisy, Nicolas 15 rue Maignac CH-120 Genève / CH | [1991/21] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o SOCIETE DE PROTECTION DES INVENTIONS 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1991/21] | Application number, filing date | 90403203.4 | 12.11.1990 | [1991/21] | Priority number, date | FR19890014904 | 14.11.1989 Original published format: FR 8914904 | [1991/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428446 | Date: | 22.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B17/22 | [1991/21] | CPC: |
G02B6/4296 (EP);
A61B1/00165 (EP);
A61B18/245 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI [1991/21] | Title | German: | Vereinfachtes Beobachtungs- und Laserbehandlungsendoskop brauchbar in einer menschlichen Körperhöhle | [1991/21] | English: | Simplified observation and laser-treatment endoscope for use in a cavity of a human body | [1991/21] | French: | Endoscope simplifié d'observation et d'intervention par tirs lasers dans une cavité du corps humain | [1991/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 01.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/48] | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1992 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4830460 ; | [Y]US3329074 ; | [Y]EP0297190 ; | [A]EP0326400 ; | [A]US4272156 |