EP0429360 - Inhibition of withdrawal syndrome [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1994 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.1994 [1994/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08026 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 E-08026 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frigola-Constansa, Jordi Av. Diagonal, 299 at.1a E-08013 Barcelone / ES | 02 /
Pares-Corominas, Juan Padilla, 349, 3o 3a E-08025 Barcelone / ES | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Ahner, Francis, et al CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403284.4 | 21.11.1990 | [1991/22] | Priority number, date | FR19890015316 | 22.11.1989 Original published format: FR 8915316 | [1991/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0429360 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0429360 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0429360 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D233/56 (EP,US);
C07D249/08 (EP,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | Verhinderung von Entzugserscheinungen | [1991/22] | English: | Inhibition of withdrawal syndrome | [1991/22] | French: | Inhibition du syndrome d'abstinence | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Examination requested [1991/46] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0285008 (BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]); | [AP]EP0382637 (ESTEVE LABOR DR [ES]) |