EP0430806 - Process for the preparation of haloketals from enamines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC NUTRITION ANIMALE Rue Marcel Lingot 03600 Commentry / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC NUTRITION ANIMALE Rue Marcel Lingot F-03600 Commentry / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chabardes, Pierre 24 rue Jeanne d'Arc F-69110 Sainte-Foy Les Lyon / FR | 02 /
Duhamel, Lucette 32 rue Jacques Boutrolles F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 03 /
Duhamel, Pierre 32 rue Jacques Boutrolles F-76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | 04 /
Guillemont, Jérômes 7 rue Rioult F-27210 Beuzeville / FR | 05 /
Poirier, Jean-Marie 17 Impasse de la Grande Madeleine F-76160 Saint-Martin du Vivier / FR | [1991/23] | Representative(s) | Le Pennec, Magali, et al Aventis Pharma S.A. Direction des Brevets Tri LEO/144 20 Avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | Le Pennec, Magali, et al RHONE-POULENC RORER SA, Direction des Brevets, 20 Avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403392.5 | 29.11.1990 | [1991/23] | Priority number, date | FR19890015868 | 01.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8915868 | [1991/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0430806 | Date: | 05.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0430806 | Date: | 08.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/313, C07C251/30, C07D295/06, C07D317/16, C07C41/50 | [1991/23] | CPC: |
C07D295/067 (EP,US);
C07C403/14 (EP,US);
C07C43/313 (EP,US);
C07C45/56 (EP,US);
C07D317/16 (EP,US);
C07F9/65515 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/56, C07C47/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Halogenacetalen aus Enaminen | [1991/23] | English: | Process for the preparation of haloketals from enamines | [1991/23] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'halogénoacétals à partir d'énamines | [1991/23] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/04] | 24.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.1994 | GB | 08.06.1994 | GR | 08.06.1994 | DK | 29.11.1994 | BE | 30.11.1994 | CH | 30.11.1994 | ES | 30.11.1994 | LI | 30.11.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | SE | 30.11.1994 | [2004/28] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
GR | 08.06.1994 | ||
DK | 29.11.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1996/16] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
DK | 29.11.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1996/04] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
BE | 30.11.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
SE | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
CH | 30.11.1994 | ||
LI | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | AT | 08.06.1994 | |
GB | 08.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 08.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3428633 (SPEZIALE ANGELO JOHN, et al); | [A]DE2708281 (RHONE POULENC IND); | [A]DE2708304 (RHONE POULENC IND) | Examination | - Bull. Soc. Chim. Fr., 1964. pages 1205, 1206 | - Bull. Chem. Soc. Jpn. Vol.58, pages 2427, 2428; | - Chem. Lett. 1982, pages 1307, 1308; | - Tet. Lett. 1972, pages 1997-2000 |