EP0432032 - Sealing strip for tunnel lining segments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE JOINT FRANCAIS, Société en Nom Collectif 2, Rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | For all designated states LE JOINT FRANCAIS, Société en Nom Collectif 2, Rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colin, Olivier 20 Bis, Rue Jean Moulin F-95100 Argenteuil / FR | [1991/24] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/24] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403436.0 | 04.12.1990 | [1991/24] | Priority number, date | FR19890015967 | 04.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8915967 | [1991/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0432032 | Date: | 12.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0432032 | Date: | 29.12.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E21D11/38 | [1991/24] | CPC: |
E21D11/385 (EP);
E21D11/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/24] | Title | German: | Dichtungsprofil für Tunnelausbausegmente | [1991/24] | English: | Sealing strip for tunnel lining segments | [1991/24] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité en élastomère pour voussoir de tunnel | [1991/24] | Examination procedure | 13.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 29.12.1993 | SE | 29.12.1993 | [1995/08] |
Former [1994/43] | SE | 29.12.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1067976 (REDFERN HOLDINGS LTD); | [A]GB2017194 (DAETWYLER AG); | [A]FR2559542 (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]); | [A]EP0270287 (BENFORD EDWARD JOHN); | [A]EP0308561 (JOINT FRANCAIS [FR]) |