EP0437994 - Modular structure for the construction of prefabricated buildings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOIS SCIES MANUFACTURES, Sociéte Anonyme dite: 45, rue d'Armentières F-59560 Comines / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states BOIS SCIES MANUFACTURES, Sociéte Anonyme dite: 45, rue d'Armentières F-59560 Comines / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Decarpigny, Gérard 32, rue du Riez Bouriez F-59112 Annoeullin / FR | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Lepage, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lemoine & Associés 86, Boulevard Carnot 59000 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | Lepage, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lemoine & Associés, 30, Boulevard de la Liberté F-59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403555.7 | 12.12.1990 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | FR19900000894 | 19.01.1990 Original published format: FR 9000894 | [1991/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0437994 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0437994 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/26 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
E04B1/2604 (EP);
E04B1/34838 (EP);
E04B2001/2644 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Modulstruktur zum Bau von Gebäuden aus Fertigteilen | [1991/30] | English: | Modular structure for the construction of prefabricated buildings | [1991/30] | French: | Structure modulaire pour la construction de bâtiments préfabriqués | [1991/30] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/36] | 05.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.1994 | DE | 18.05.1994 | ES | 18.05.1994 | GB | 18.05.1994 | GR | 18.05.1994 | IT | 18.05.1994 | NL | 18.05.1994 | SE | 18.05.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
ES | 18.05.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
GR | 18.05.1994 | ||
IT | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
SE | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
GR | 18.05.1994 | ||
IT | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
SE | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
GR | 18.05.1994 | ||
IT | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
IT | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/19] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
GB | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
NL | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | AT | 18.05.1994 | |
DE | 18.05.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 18.05.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2883711 (KUMP ERNEST J); | [A]DE3128505 (VORMANN AUGUST KG [DE]); | [Y]US4398841 (KOJIMA HAJIME [JP], et al); | [A]FR2560248 (MARTIN JOSEPH [FR]); | [A]US4616950 (MORRIS TOM C [US]); | [A]US4781007 (BIANCHI JEAN-LUC F [FR], et al); | [Y]FR2633956 (OBB CONSTRUCTION SARL [FR]) |