EP0434559 - Assembling by interlocking of two Z-profiles for the realization of a purlin, transom or floor support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1999 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2000 [2000/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROFILCOMETUBE 2, Rue de Beauvais 60930 Bailleul-sur-Therain / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | For all designated states PROFILCOMETUBE 2, Rue de Beauvais F-60930 Bailleul-sur-Therain / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mouty, Jean 199, Grande Avenue F-60260 Lamorlaye / FR | [1991/26] | Representative(s) | Degret, Jacques Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | DEGRET, Jacques Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 90403686.0 | 19.12.1990 | [1991/26] | Priority number, date | FR19890016828 | 19.12.1989 Original published format: FR 8916828 | [1991/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0434559 | Date: | 26.06.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/58, E04C3/06 | [1991/26] | CPC: |
E04B7/024 (EP);
E04C3/06 (EP);
E04C2003/0421 (EP);
E04C2003/0434 (EP);
E04C2003/0482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/26] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung durch Überlappung von zwei Z-Profilen zur Herstellung einer Pfette, eines Riegels oder Fussbodenauflagers | [1991/26] | English: | Assembling by interlocking of two Z-profiles for the realization of a purlin, transom or floor support | [1991/26] | French: | Assemblage par emboîtement de deux profilés à section en droite en Z, notamment pour la réalisation d'une panne, d'une lisse ou d'un support de plancher | [1991/26] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/26] | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.09.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 17.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1999 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/01] | Request for further processing for: | 23.03.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 13.03.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.1998 | Decision despatched | 21.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 20.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 12.12.1996 | Decision despatched | 28.03.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 23.03.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 03.05.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1534297 ; | [Y]AT366744B ; | [A]BE892263 ; | [A]CA1243185 |