EP0382652 - Stringing apparatus for a tennis racket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BABOLAT VS 93 rue André Bollier F-69007 Lyon / FR | [1990/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Longeat, Gérard 41 Rue Lieutenant Colonel Prévost F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1990/33] | Representative(s) | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | Guerre, Dominique, et al Cabinet Germain et Maureau 20 Boulevard Eugène Deruelle BP 3011 F-69392 Lyon Cédex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420037.5 | 25.01.1990 | [1990/33] | Priority number, date | FR19890001920 | 07.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8901920 | [1990/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0382652 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0382652 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A63B51/14 | [1990/33] | CPC: |
A63B51/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bespannen eines Tennisschlägers | [1990/33] | English: | Stringing apparatus for a tennis racket | [1990/33] | French: | Appareil pour le cordage d'une raquette de tennis | [1990/33] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/40] | 25.03.1991 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1991 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 12.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 21.10.1992 | [2000/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR43577E ; | [A]DE2243272 (JENAER GLASWERK SCHOTT & GEN); | [A]EP0136245 (MOREL TECHNIC [FR]); | [Y]US4706955 (NGADI SUMIATY [TW], et al) |