EP0388321 - Piperidinyle compounds and their use as a photostabilizer for polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/38] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gay, Michel 10 rue Henri Rolland F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | 02 /
Lavault, Sylvie 17 rue Jassron F-69003 Lyon / FR | [1990/38] | Representative(s) | Trolliet, Maurice, et al Rhodia Services Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40 Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/46] | Trolliet, Maurice, et al RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE, Direction de la Propriété Industrielle, Centre de Recherches des Carrières, B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1992/10] | Ricalens, François RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1990/38] | Vignally, Noel Rhône-Poulenc Chimie Service Brevets Chimie Centre de Recherches des Carrières B.P. 62 F-69192 Saint-Fons Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420051.6 | 30.01.1990 | [1990/38] | Priority number, date | FR19890001653 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: FR 8901653 | [1990/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388321 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388321 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | FR | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/388, C08L101/00, C08K5/54 | [1990/38] | CPC: |
C08L23/02 (EP,US);
C08G77/388 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L101/00, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L101/00, C08L83/00 (US,EP);
C08L23/02, C08L83/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/38] | Title | German: | Piperidinyl-Verbindungen und deren Anwendung zur Photostabilisierung von Polymeren | [1990/38] | English: | Piperidinyle compounds and their use as a photostabilizer for polymers | [1990/38] | French: | Nouveaux composés à fonction pipéridinyle et leur application dans la photostabilisation des polymères | [1990/38] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/21: Teilanmeldung 95103303.4 eingereicht am 30/01/90 | EPB 1995/21: Divisional application 95103303.4 filed on 30/01/90 | EPB 1995/21: Demande divisionnaire 95103303.4 déposée le 30/01/90 | Examination procedure | 02.11.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 21.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP95103303.4 / EP0665258 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Request for further processing for: | 22.04.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2312502 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [Y]FR2351144 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | [YD]EP0162524 (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]); | [Y]EP0263561 (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]); | [XP]US4859759 (MAYCOCK WILLIAM E [US], et al); | [XP]EP0343717 (ENICHEM SINTESI [IT]) | Examination | DD236103 | - W. Noll, Chemistry and Technology of Silicones, 2. Ed. (1968) Academic Press, p. 374, 572, 573 | by applicant | EP0162524 | US4698381 | EP0343717 |