Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
05.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.02.1995 [1995/08] |
14.01.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.03.1994 [1994/09] |
25.06.1993 | First examination report | |
02.03.1993 | Change - representative | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] |
15.01.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.1991 [1991/10] |
28.07.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.09.1990 [1990/37] |