EP0401131 - Electrical switch with rotating arc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERLIN GERIN 2, chemin des Sources F-38240 Meylan / FR | [1990/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bolongeat-Mobleu, Roger Merlin Gerin - Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR | 02 /
Raphard, Denis Merlin Gerin - Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR | 03 /
Boyer, Jean-Pierre Merlin Gerin - Sce. Brevets F-38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR | [1990/49] | Representative(s) | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Propriété Industrielle 38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/24] | Ritzenthaler, Jacques, et al Merlin Gerin Sce. Propriété Industrielle F-38050 Grenoble Cédex 9 / FR | ||
Former [1990/49] | Kern, Paul Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420243.9 | 18.05.1990 | [1990/49] | Priority number, date | FR19890007290 | 31.05.1989 Original published format: FR 8907290 | [1990/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0401131 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01H33/18 | [1990/49] | CPC: |
H01H33/187 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, SE [1990/49] | Title | German: | Elektrischer Schalter mit rotierendem Lichtbogen | [1990/49] | English: | Electrical switch with rotating arc | [1990/49] | French: | Interrupteur électrique à arc tournant | [1990/49] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/39] | 29.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1994 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3763340 (NOACK D); | [A]FR2493034 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [A]EP0053524 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [Y]GB2103018 (INT STANDARD ELECTRIC CORP [US], et al); | [Y]EP0092205 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) |