Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
24.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.1995 [1995/33] |
08.07.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] |
15.09.1993 | Change - representative | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] |
11.02.1993 | First examination report | |
25.02.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |
25.02.1992 | Change - representative | published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |
22.02.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.1991 [1991/15] |
15.12.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] |