Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0410913 | Global Dossier | 24.08.1994 | B1 | EP0410913 | 30.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE110337T | 15.09.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2021858 | 18.10.1994 | C | CA2021858 | 29.01.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69011779T | 15.12.1994 | T2 | DE69011779D1 | 29.09.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0410913T | 19.09.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2058862T | 01.11.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2650253 | 04.10.1991 | B1 | FR2650253 | 01.02.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE66141 | 13.12.1995 | B1 | IE902683 | 27.02.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IS1585B | 01.03.1996 | B | IS3607 | 29.01.1991 | A7 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0729658B | 05.04.1995 | B2 | JPH03187855 | 15.08.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO903344L | 29.01.1991 | L | NO903344D0 | 27.07.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT8445U | 09.08.1995 | U | PT8445T | 30.09.1992 | T | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT94844 | 31.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5046630 | 10.09.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8910455 | 28.07.1989 |