EP0413645 - Method of producing a mesa MOS transistor of the silicon on insulator type [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/06] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray F-75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1991/08] | For all designated states ETAT FRANCAIS représenté par le Ministre des Postes, Télécommunications et de l'Espace (CENTRE NATIONAL D'ETUDES DES TELECOMMUNICATIONS), 38-40 rue du Général Leclerc F-92131 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haond, Michel 5, Rue de l'Oisans F-38240 Meylan / FR | 02 /
Galvier, Jean 6, Rue Camille Desmoulins F-38400 Saint Martin D' Hères / FR | [1991/08] | Representative(s) | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion 38000 Grenoble / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/08] | de Beaumont, Michel 1bis, rue Champollion F-38000 Grenoble / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420374.2 | 09.08.1990 | [1991/08] | Priority number, date | FR19890011228 | 16.08.1989 Original published format: FR 8911228 | [1991/08] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0413645 | Date: | 20.02.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0413645 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/84, H01L29/772 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
H01L29/66772 (EP,US);
H01L21/32139 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
Y10S148/051 (EP,US);
Y10S148/161 (EP,US);
Y10S438/978 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/08] | H01L21/336, H01L21/84, H01L29/784 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1991/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Mesa-MOS-Transistors des Typs SOI | [1991/08] | English: | Method of producing a mesa MOS transistor of the silicon on insulator type | [1991/08] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de transistor MOS mésa de type silicium sur isolant | [1991/08] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 26.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.07.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2000/27] | NL | 31.08.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4753896 (MATLOUBIAN MISHEL [US]) |