EP0419378 - Apparatus for treating a static aluminium bath of large surface area using gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY RHENALU 6, place de l'Iris Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | For all designated states PECHINEY RHENALU 6, place de l'Iris Tour Manhattan La Défense 2 F-92400 COURBEVOIE / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baud, Olivier Chemin de Pardines F-63500 Issoire / FR | 02 /
Boeuf, Franck Schmiedgasse 7 CH-8313 Ottikon / CH | [1991/13] | Representative(s) | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cédex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/13] | Vanlaer, Marcel, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cédex 3 / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420406.2 | 17.09.1990 | [1991/13] | Priority number, date | FR19890012540 | 20.09.1989 Original published format: FR 8912540 | [1991/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0419378 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0419378 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C22B21/06, C22B9/05, F27D23/04 | [1991/13] | CPC: |
F27D27/00 (EP,US);
C22B21/064 (EP,US);
C22B9/05 (EP,US);
F27D3/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/13] | Title | German: | Begasungsvorrichtung für ein stationäres Aluminium-Schmelzbad mit grosser Oberfläche | [1991/13] | English: | Apparatus for treating a static aluminium bath of large surface area using gases | [1991/13] | French: | Dispositif de traitement au moyen de gaz d'un bain liquide d'aluminium de grande surface maintenu à l'état stationnaire dans un four | [1991/13] | Examination procedure | 17.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.1994 | DK | 06.04.1994 | GR | 06.04.1994 | SE | 06.04.1994 | LU | 30.09.1994 | [2002/23] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
DK | 06.04.1994 | ||
GR | 06.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.09.1994 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
DK | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1635037 (JOHN EDWARDS); | [A]US3227547 (SZEKELY ANDREW G); | [A]US3743263 (SZEKELY A); | [AD]US3870511 (SZEKELY ANDREW GEZA); | [A]AT330470B (VMW RANSHOFEN BERNDORF AG [AT]); | [A]AT336900B (VMW RANSHOFEN BERNDORF AG [AT]); | [Y]US4327901 (KAISER GEORGE S); | [A]EP0077282 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]); | [A]EP0245601 (SHOWA ALUMINUM CORP [JP]) |