EP0427642 - Cooling device for the inductor of a linear motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRIQUES DU CENTRE CELDUC Société Anonyme La Mollanche F-42290 Sorbiers(Loire) / FR | [1991/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Combette, Marc Bâtiment B, Résidence Bel Air F-42480 La Fouillouse (Loire) / FR | [1991/20] | Representative(s) | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/20] | Perrier, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République F-42000 St-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 90420460.9 | 25.10.1990 | [1991/20] | Priority number, date | FR19890014620 | 30.10.1989 Original published format: FR 8914620 | [1991/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0427642 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0427642 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H02K41/025, H02K9/00 | [1991/20] | CPC: |
H02K9/00 (EP,US);
H02K3/24 (EP,US);
H02K41/025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1991/20] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Kühlung eines Induktors in einem Linearmotor | [1991/20] | English: | Cooling device for the inductor of a linear motor | [1991/20] | French: | Dispositif de refroidissement pour inducteur de moteur linéaire | [1991/20] | Examination procedure | 13.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/28] | 19.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Request for further processing for: | 04.08.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 04.08.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 12.01.1994 | IT | 12.01.1994 | [1999/42] |
Former [1994/49] | GB | 12.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2497420 (GUIMBAL JEAN [FR]); | [AD]FR2382792 (GUIMBAL JEAN [FR]); | [AD]FR2330189 (GUIMBAL JEAN [FR]); | [AD]FR2142871 (GUIMBAL JEAN) | by applicant | FR2142871 | FR2330189 | FR2382792 |